Roberts v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Daniel T Roberts
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv01836
Filed: July 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. All pending motions [ECF Nos. 28 , 29 ] are DENIED as moot. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/2/2018. Motions due by 6/6/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/5/2018. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/2/2018. Motions due by 5/6/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that 16 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott A Flinders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel T Roberts
Represented By: Lloyd W. Baker
Represented By: Kevin Lazar
Represented By: Christian Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?