Sandberg v. FMMR Investments Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Sandberg
Defendant: FMMR Investments Inc. and Kravitz, Schnitzer & Johnson, Chtd.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01840
Filed: July 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 15 Notice of Settlement. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until 11/17/2017, to either file a stipulation to dismiss with prejudice, or a joint status report advising when the stipulation will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). FMMR Investments Inc. answer due 9/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandberg v. FMMR Investments Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMMR Investments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kravitz, Schnitzer & Johnson, Chtd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Sandberg
Represented By: Michael Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?