Castelan-Gutierrez v. Bodega Latina Corporation
Plaintiff: Maria M. Castelan-Gutierrez
Defendant: Bodega Latina Corporation
Case Number: 2:2017cv01877
Filed: July 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Extend Time; Discovery due by 6/4/2018. Motions due by 7/3/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Stipulation; Discovery due by 4/4/2018. Motions due by 5/4/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/4/2018. The deadline to amend the pleadings remains December 1, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Hearing re 9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2017 at 11:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castelan-Gutierrez v. Bodega Latina Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bodega Latina Corporation
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Represented By: Micah Keir Mtatabikwa Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria M. Castelan-Gutierrez
Represented By: Orlando De Castroverde
Represented By: Alex De Castroverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?