Lynch v. State of Nevada et al
Petitioner: Ossiris Dizon Lynch
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2017cv01897
Filed: July 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Certificate of Appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 9 respondents' motion to dismiss is GRANTED as described. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have 30 days to file a declaration as described. See order for further deadlines and specifications. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER denying 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall file a response to the petition, including potentially by motion to dismi ss, within ninety (90) days of service of the petition. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have forty-five (45) days from service of the answer, motion to dismiss, or other response to file a reply or opposition. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties SHALL SEND courtesy copies of all exhibits in this case to the Clerk of Court, 400 S. Virginia St., Reno, NV, 89501. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ossiris Dizon Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?