U.S. Bank National Association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Southern Highlands Community Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01899
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 AMENDED ORDER that the $500 deposit be refunded in accordance with the 21 Certificate of Cash Deposit to U.S. Bank National Association c/o Snell &Wilmer, LLP unless a party objects to this order by no later than 10 days. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - SLD)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 93 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting 87 Third Stipulation Re: 79 and 81 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/22/2019. Replies due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 84 Second Stipulation Re: 79 and 81 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/8/2019. Replies due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting 82 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 79 , 81 Motions for Summary Judgment (First Request). Responses due by 1/25/2019. Replies due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting 73 Third Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 58 Renewal of Motion for Judgment. Southern Highlands' Replies due by 11/27/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 58 Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Responses due by 10/16/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation to Extend Re: 56 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/2/2018. Replies due by 10/16/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 57 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 56 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/13/2018. Replies due by 9/27/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that this case is hereby STAYED. Defendant's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. All other pending motions are DENIED without prejudice (see Order for deadlines). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 26 Motion for Summary Judgment, 35 Motion for Judgment. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 27 Motion to Stay Discovery. Replies due by 3/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 22 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/12/2018. Replies due by 2/26/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Defendant's 14 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs and Granting Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Bond. Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association shall post a cost bond with the Court in the amount of $500 or make a cash deposit of $500 as to Defendant within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Highlands Community Association
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David J. Rothenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Robin E Perkins
Represented By: Adam Q. Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?