Sharpe v. Grundy et al.
Plaintiff: Ray Sharpe
Defendant: Alisha Grundy and Officer #6541
Case Number: 2:2017cv01905
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 10 The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in full; This case is DISMISSED with prejudice; The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT ACCORDINGLY and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 5 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay the base filing fee of $350.00 on or before 2/5/2018. The Clerk of Court shall MAIL Plaintiff two copies of this Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 1 , 3 Plaintiff Ray Sharpe's Applications to Proceed In Forma Pauperis are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall RETAIN 1 -1 the Complaint, but SHALL NOT issue summons. The Clerk of Cour t shall MAIL Sharpe a blank IFP application for incarcerated litigants along with instructions for completing the application. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharpe v. Grundy et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisha Grundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer #6541
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?