Huerta v. Bodega Latina Corporation
Plaintiff: Margarita Huerta
Defendant: Bodega Latina Corporation
Case Number: 2:2017cv01915
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 22 the defendants' motion in limine and 23 motion for summary judgment are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 22 Motion in Limine (First Request). Responses due by 7/30/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying 9 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huerta v. Bodega Latina Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bodega Latina Corporation
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Represented By: Micah Keir Mtatabikwa Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Huerta
Represented By: Jared B Anderson
Represented By: David J. Churchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?