Carloni v. McDougal
Plaintiff: Adam Carloni
Defendant: Shane McDougal
Case Number: 2:2017cv01917
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Substitute Party. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the caption for this action is hereby modified to reflect the substitution of the United States for Shane McDougal, as the defendant in this matter. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 20 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 19 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Stay. FURTHER ORDERED that the stay of discovery will automatically lift upon the Court's denial of 3 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carloni v. McDougal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Carloni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane McDougal
Represented By: Lindsy Michele Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?