Credit Suisse v. Lattig et al
Appellant: Credit Suisse
In Re: Gold Club at Lake Las Vegas LLC, LLV Four Corners, LLC, LLV Holdco, LLC, LLV-1, LLC, LLVVHI LLC, Lake Las Vegas Properties, LLC, Lake at Las Vegas Joint Venture, LLC, Marina Investors LLC, Neva Holdings LLC, Northshore Golf Club LLC, P-3 at Montelago Village LLC, Southshore Golf Club LLC, TC Technologies LLC, TCH Development LLC and Vineyard at Lake Las Vegas LLC
Appellee: Larry Lattig
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2017cv01975
Filed: July 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Briefing Schedule (Fourth Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Briefing Schedule (Third Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Stipulation; Opening brief due by 4/6/2018. Answering brief due by 5/4/2018. Reply Appeal Brief due by 5/18/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule and Correct Parties to Appeal. Opening brief due by 3/2/2018. Answering Appeal Brief due by 4/6/2018. Reply Appeal Brief due by 4/20/2018. Claymore Holdings, LLC shall not be deemed to be a party to this appeal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 20 appellants' motion for leave to appeal be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 4 appellant's motion for clarification is GRANTED. Appellant has fourteen (14) days following the date an order granting leave to appeal is entered to file its designation and statement. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Credit Suisse v. Lattig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Credit Suisse
Represented By: William M. Noall
Represented By: Elizabeth W Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Gold Club at Lake Las Vegas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: LLV Four Corners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: LLV Holdco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: LLV-1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: LLVVHI LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Lake Las Vegas Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Lake at Las Vegas Joint Venture, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Marina Investors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Neva Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Northshore Golf Club LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: P-3 at Montelago Village LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Southshore Golf Club LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: TC Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: TCH Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Vineyard at Lake Las Vegas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Larry Lattig
Represented By: Robert M. Charles, Jr.
Represented By: Gary Crusiani, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?