Flores v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Robert Flores |
Defendant: |
Jonathan Sorola and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. |
Unknown: |
Brenda H Entzminger |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01991 |
Filed: |
July 21, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 4, 2018 |
Filing
47
ORDER granting 46 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
April 18, 2018 |
Filing
45
ORDER re: 44 Notice of Settlement. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal no later than May 18, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 20, 2018 |
Filing
43
ORDER granting 42 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/10/2018. Motions due by 9/7/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 8, 2018 |
Filing
41
ORDER that 40 Stipulation Regarding FRCP 35 Examination of Plaintiff is DENIED as unnecessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 2, 2018 |
Filing
39
ORDER granting 38 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 6/11/2018. Motions due by 7/9/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 13, 2017 |
Filing
37
ORDER granting 36 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/10/2018. Motions due by 5/8/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 22, 2017 |
Filing
25
ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 26, 2017 |
Filing
7
ORDER Granting 5 Notice fo Dissociation of Counsel. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to remove Ms. Entzminger from the CM/ECF distribution list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?