Federal Trade Commission v. Revmountain LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Blair Mcnea, Absolutely Working LLC, Action Pro White LLC, Anasazi Management Partners LLC, Bellaathome LLC, Blizzardwhite LLC, Blue Rocket Brands LLC, Body Tropical LLC, Boulder Black Diamond LLC, Boulder Creek Internet Solutions Inc, Brand Force LLC, Brass Triangle LLC, Bridge Ford LLC, Brookville Lane LLC, Cherry Blitz LLC, Circle of Youth Skincare LLC, Condor Canyon LLC, Convertis LLC, Convertis Marketing LLC, Dental Pro at Home LLC, Dermaglam LLC, Desert Gecko LLC, Doing What's Possible LLC, Elation White LLC, First Class Whitening LLC, Flat Iron Avenue LLC, Danielle Foss, Greenville Creek LLC, Honey Lake LLC, How and Why LLC, Indigo Systems LLC, Ivorypro LLC, Jasper Woods LLC, Jennifer Johnson, Juniper Solutions LLC, Mint House LLC, Newport Crossing LLC, Night Watch Group LLC, Revguard LLC, Revlive!, LLC, Revmountain LLC, Roadrunner B2C LLC, Roirunner LLC, Salamonie River LLC, Sandstone Beach LLC, Sedona Beauty Secrets LLC, Skinnyiq LLC, Smile Pro Direct LLC, Snow Sale LLC, Solid Ice LLC, Spark Whitening LLC, Spruce River LLC, Three Lakes LLC, Thunder Avenue LLC, Titanwhite LLC, Trimxt LLC, Turtle Mountains LLC, University and Folsom LLC, Walnut Street Marketing Inc, Wave Rock LLC, Wheeler Peak Marketing LLC and Wild Farms LLC
Receiver: Joshua Teeple
Case Number: 2:2017cv02000
Filed: July 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0053 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Granting 129 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Final Report (First Request). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Granting 116 -3 Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Other Equitable Relief as to Defendant Blair McNea and all Corporate Defendants. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting 112 Stipulation to Stay Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 104 Emergency Motion for Reconsideration Re: 103 Order. The Court's 103 Order Granting Defendants' 102 Motion to Stay is deemed withdrawn. Defendants have until 1/19/2018 to file its Reply to its motion to stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting 85 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 41 Defendants Revguard LLC, Revlive!, LLC, and Roadrunner B2C LLC's Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 Stipulation Authorizing Joshua Teeple, Permanent Receiver, to: 1. Vacate Louisville, Colorado Premises; and 2. Reject Lease by Receiver Joshua Teeple. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Asset Freeze and other Equitable Relief as to Defendant Danielle Foss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 57 Motion for Disbursement of Funds for Defendant Danielle Foss's Living Expenses. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order with Asset Freeze, Appointment of Receiver, and other Equitable Relief as to Defendants Blair McNea, Jennifer Johnson, and Entity Defendants. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 41 the defendants' motion to seal is TEMPORARILY GRANTED. The defendants may file the exhibits under seal and must do so immediately if they want me to review them for tomorrow's hearing. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation Authorizing Joshua Teeple, Temporary Receiver, to: 1. Employ Auctioneer to Sell Personal Property; and 2. Vacate Henderson, Nevada Premises. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to 17 Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Response Deadlines. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Revmountain LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair Mcnea
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolutely Working LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Pro White LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anasazi Management Partners LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellaathome LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blizzardwhite LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Rocket Brands LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Body Tropical LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Black Diamond LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Creek Internet Solutions Inc
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Force LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brass Triangle LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridge Ford LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookville Lane LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Blitz LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle of Youth Skincare LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condor Canyon LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convertis LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convertis Marketing LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dental Pro at Home LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermaglam LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Gecko LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doing What's Possible LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elation White LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Class Whitening LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flat Iron Avenue LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Foss
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Rachel Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenville Creek LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honey Lake LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: How and Why LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indigo Systems LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivorypro LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasper Woods LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Johnson
Represented By: Gabriel A. Blumberg
Represented By: Eric D. Hone
Represented By: Richard B Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juniper Solutions LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mint House LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Crossing LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Night Watch Group LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revguard LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlive!, LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revmountain LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadrunner B2C LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roirunner LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salamonie River LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandstone Beach LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedona Beauty Secrets LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skinnyiq LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smile Pro Direct LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snow Sale LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solid Ice LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spark Whitening LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spruce River LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Lakes LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Avenue LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titanwhite LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trimxt LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Mountains LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University and Folsom LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walnut Street Marketing Inc
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wave Rock LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeler Peak Marketing LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild Farms LLC
Represented By: Giovanni Michael Ruscitti
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Represented By: Claude Wild Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Michelle Schaefer
Represented By: Sarah Waldrop
Represented By: Blaine T Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Joshua Teeple
Represented By: Peter Alan Davidson
Represented By: Bart K Larsen
Represented By: Byron Z. Moldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?