Chamaria et al v. Diab et al
Defendant: Tony Diab and Matthew Gregory Jones
Unknown: Gauri Chamaria, Puja Chamaria, Vishal Chamaria, Vivek Chamaria, Chip Shop LLC, G & M Management Services, Inc., P & V LLC and Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02023
Filed: July 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. All pending motions 10 , 20 , 35 are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation to Extend Time re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Replies due by 9/22/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation to Extend Time re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Replies due by 9/21/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation to Extend Time re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. ( Replies due by 9/18/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation to Extend Time. ( Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation to Extend Time re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Responses due by 8/30/2017; Replies due by 9/8/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation to Extend Time re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. ( Responses due by 8/22/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING 5 Motion for TRO. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamaria et al v. Diab et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Gauri Chamaria
Represented By: Alexis Brown, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Puja Chamaria
Represented By: Alexis Brown, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Vishal Chamaria
Represented By: Alexis Brown, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Vivek Chamaria
Represented By: Alexis Brown, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Chip Shop LLC
Represented By: Alexis Brown, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: G & M Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Hofland & Tomsheck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: P & V LLC
Represented By: Alexis Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.
Represented By: Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Diab
Represented By: Tony M Diab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Gregory Jones
Represented By: Bradley J. Hofland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?