Harlow et al v. Nevada Properties 1 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chris Harlow and Demia Harlow
Defendant: Gray Clarke, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Nevada Property 1 LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02082
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 31 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Stipulation; Motions due by 9/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Stipulation; Discovery due by 7/16/2018. Motions due by 8/14/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court for the Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada must transfer the following funds to the Clerk of Court for the United States Di strict Court for the District of Nevada. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs must serve a copy of this order on the Clerk of Court for the Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, and file proof of that service by September 22, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harlow et al v. Nevada Properties 1 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Property 1 LLC
Represented By: Kimberley A. Hyson
Represented By: Martin J. Kravitz
Represented By: Gina Mushmeche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Harlow
Represented By: Lucas Grower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demia Harlow
Represented By: Lucas Grower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?