Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Craig R. Smith
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv02092
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 19 Motion to Remand ; ORDER granting 22 Countermotion to Affirm the Agency Decision; ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 25 Report and Recommendation; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 19 Motion to Remand to Agency. Responses due by 1/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulation; Motion for Reversal and/or remand due by 12/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Clerk to serve summons and Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Amended Complaint deadline: 8/16/2017. Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Sharon Lahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig R. Smith
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?