Wilcock v. Gentry et al
Petitioner: Patrick Edward Wilcock
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Jo Gentry
Case Number: 2:2017cv02101
Filed: August 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 79 Motion to Extend Time re 70 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 2/21/2023. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 74 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 70 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/17/2023. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Motion to Extend Time re 70 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/18/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 53 Motion to Extend Time nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 51 Motion to Extend Time. Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Jo Gentry answer due 7/26/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/31/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Motion to Extend Time. Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Jo Gentry answer due 5/27/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/28/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 40 Motion to Reopen Case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay is lifted and the Clerk of Court is directed to: REOPEN this case; DETACH and FILE 42 -1 the third-amended petition; and ASSIGN A DIFFERENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE to this matter. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 30 petitioner's motion for issuance of stay and abeyance of this federal habeas corpus proceeding is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending final resolution of petitioner's postconvi ction habeas petition. Petitioner must return to federal court with a motion to reopen this case within 45 days of the issuance of the remittitur by the Supreme Court of Nevada at the conclusion of the state-court proceedings on his postconviction habeas petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that 14 Motion for Leave to File a Second-Amended Petition is GRANTED. Wilcock has until August 23, 2018, to FILE and SERVE his second-amended petition. FURTHER ORDERED that the deadlines set forth in the scheduling order (ECF No. 11 ) remain in effect, running from the date of service of the second-amended petition.FURTHER ORDERED that 19 Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER that Hoffman must meet with Wilock as soon as reasonably possible, if counsel has not already done so. Wilcock has until April 11, 2018, to FILE and SERVE on respondents an amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus (see order for details). FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must SEND courtesy copies of all exhibits preexisting and newly added to this court's RENO division. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER the Clerk of Court is directed to DETACH and FILE Wilcock's petition [ECF No. 1-1] and ELECTRONICALLY SERVE it on the respondents. The Clerk of Court is also directed to ADD Adam Paul Laxalt, Nevada Attorney General, as counsel for respon dents.FURTHER ORDERED that 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender (FPD) for the District of Nevada is appointed to represent Wilcock. The FPD has until January 5, 2018, to file a notice of appearance or to indi cate to the court its inability to represent Wilcock in these proceedings. FURTHER ORDERED that 3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcock v. Gentry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jo Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Edward Wilcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?