Marks v. David Saxe Productions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Marks
Defendant: David Saxe Productions, LLC, David Saxe and Saxe Management, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02110
Filed: August 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting in part 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's second and third causes of action for NRS 613.040 Violations and Tortious Discharge are REMANDED to state court. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 41 Motion for Summary Judgment (Second Request). Responses due by 1/24/2020. Replies due by 2/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Petition for Removal (Second Request). Defendants answer due 1/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/2/2018. Motions due by 5/1/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation to extend time for Plaintiff to respond to 7 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/29/2017. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Petition for Removal (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v. David Saxe Productions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Saxe Productions, LLC
Represented By: Kirsten Ann Milton
Represented By: Mahna Pourshaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Saxe
Represented By: Kirsten Ann Milton
Represented By: Mahna Pourshaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxe Management, LLC
Represented By: Kirsten Ann Milton
Represented By: Mahna Pourshaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Marks
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Gronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?