U.S. Bank National Association v. Shadow Crossings Homeowners Association et al

Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Shadow Crossings Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv02120
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Dismiss. The Bank's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice as time-barred, and the Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 14, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the claims against Shadow Crossings Homeowners Association are DISMISSED with prejudice. Shadow Crossings' 10 motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 18, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 8 SFR's Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED; the CLERK OF COURT is directed to accept the deposit of $500.00 from plaintiff under NRS 18.130 as security for costs and charges that may be awarded aga inst this plaintiff in the event that the cost bond is presented for deposit. Plaintiff must bring a copy of this order to the Clerk's office when making this deposit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is stayed by operation of NRS 18.130(1) until the $500 is deposited. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Shadow Crossings Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shadow Crossings Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Shadd A. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?