Stacey et al v. Carrington Mortgage Service, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Douglas Stacey, Shellie Stacey and Jeniece Valley
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Service, LLC and Sables, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02128
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation to Extend Time re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. ( Replies due by 10/4/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 1, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation to Extend Time. Carrington Mortgage Service, LLC answer due 9/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 22, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Stipulation to Extend Time. Carrington Mortgage Service, LLC answer due 8/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stacey et al v. Carrington Mortgage Service, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Service, LLC
Represented By: William Habdas
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sables, LLC
Represented By: Christopher S Connell
Represented By: Shadd A. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Stacey
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shellie Stacey
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeniece Valley
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?