Douglas v. Dreamdealers USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edward B Douglas
Defendant: Dreamdealers USA, LLC, David Perisset and Romain Thievin
Case Number: 2:2017cv02134
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 90 Stipulation to Continue Hearings: Calendar Call is reset for 8/3/2021 at 08:45 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Jury Trial is reset for 8/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 88 Stipulation to Continue Trial. The master trial scheduling calendar set for October 13, 2020 is vacated. The calendar call currently set for October 27, 2020 is vacated and continued to March 16, 2021 at 8:45 a.m. in LV courtroom 6C. The jury trial currently set for November 2, 2020 is vacated and continued to March 22, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. in LV courtroom 6C. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 83 Stipulation to Continue Trial. Calendar Call set for 10/27/2020 at 8:45 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 76 STIPULATION Awarding Fees and Costs to Defendants re 68 Order. Parties stipulate and agree that an award of $7,020.00 be awarded as reasonable attorneys' fees and Plaintiff shall pay this amount to Defendants within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 72 MOTION to Excuse Individual Defendants from Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Re: 72 MOTION to Excuse Individual Defendants from Settlement Conference by Defendants Dreamdealers USA, LLC., David Perisset, and Roman Thievin. Plaintiff must respond by 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 52 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 50 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's Responses due by 1/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting in part Defendants' 31 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 31 and 32 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting First 33 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 31 and 32 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/20/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Third Stipulation for Extension re Dispositive Motions Deadline. Motions due by 11/15/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/17/2018. No further extensions will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 22 Second Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/30/2018. Motions due by 10/1/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Discovery Deadlines (First Request). Discovery due by 7/31/2018. Motions due by 8/30/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Reschedule Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference rescheduled for 1/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. The settlement conference statements shall be received in Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr.'s chambers no later than 1/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas v. Dreamdealers USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward B Douglas
Represented By: Dustin L. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreamdealers USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Perisset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romain Thievin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?