June 16, 2021 |
Filing
93
ORDER granting 92 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
February 8, 2021 |
Filing
91
ORDER granting 90 Stipulation to Continue Hearings: Calendar Call is reset for 8/3/2021 at 08:45 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Jury Trial is reset for 8/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
October 8, 2020 |
Filing
89
ORDER granting 88 Stipulation to Continue Trial. The master trial scheduling calendar set for October 13, 2020 is vacated. The calendar call currently set for October 27, 2020 is vacated and continued to March 16, 2021 at 8:45 a.m. in LV courtroom 6C. The jury trial currently set for November 2, 2020 is vacated and continued to March 22, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. in LV courtroom 6C. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
August 3, 2020 |
Filing
85
ORDER granting 83 Stipulation to Continue Trial. Calendar Call set for 10/27/2020 at 8:45 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
May 6, 2020 |
Filing
77
ORDER granting 76 STIPULATION Awarding Fees and Costs to Defendants re 68 Order. Parties stipulate and agree that an award of $7,020.00 be awarded as reasonable attorneys' fees and Plaintiff shall pay this amount to Defendants within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
April 28, 2020 |
Filing
75
ORDER granting 72 MOTION to Excuse Individual Defendants from Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
April 24, 2020 |
Filing
73
ORDER Re: 72 MOTION to Excuse Individual Defendants from Settlement Conference by Defendants Dreamdealers USA, LLC., David Perisset, and Roman Thievin. Plaintiff must respond by 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
January 22, 2020 |
Filing
55
ORDER Granting 52 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 50 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's Responses due by 1/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
November 21, 2019 |
Filing
49
ORDER Granting 48 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 24, 2019 |
Filing
44
ORDER Granting in part Defendants' 31 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
December 20, 2018 |
Filing
36
ORDER Granting 35 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 31 and 32 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
December 6, 2018 |
Filing
34
ORDER Granting First 33 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 31 and 32 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/20/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 12, 2018 |
Filing
30
ORDER Granting 29 Third Stipulation for Extension re Dispositive Motions Deadline. Motions due by 11/15/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/17/2018. No further extensions will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
July 12, 2018 |
Filing
27
ORDER Granting 22 Second Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/30/2018. Motions due by 10/1/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 13, 2018 |
Filing
20
ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Discovery Deadlines (First Request). Discovery due by 7/31/2018. Motions due by 8/30/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing
16
ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Reschedule Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference rescheduled for 1/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. The settlement conference statements shall be received in Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr.'s chambers no later than 1/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|