List Industries Inc. v. List
Plaintiff: List Industries Inc.
Defendant: Larry List
Case Number: 2:2017cv02159
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the Clerk of Court must add the address for Defendant Larry List to the docket sheet. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk must mail copies of Order 10 , 12 , and 13 to Mr. List. FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing regarding Mr. LIst 9;s competency is re-set for Monday, October 23, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3C. Mr. List must attend the hearing in person.FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. List must file any documentary evidence that he has pertaining to his competency by October 16, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting hearing re Defendant Larry Lists's competency for 10/2/2017 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Defendant Larry List to provide any documentary evidence pertaining to his competence by 9/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 3 Ex Parte Motion for TRO.; denying 4 Ex Parte Motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Plaintiff - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: List Industries Inc. v. List
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry List
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: List Industries Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?