Stath v. Wells Fargo, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Michael J. Stath
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Trans Union LLC and Wells Fargo, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02163
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 20, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation to Extend Time. Experian Information Solutions, Inc answer due 9/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 1, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation to Extend Time. Trans Union LLC answer due 10/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 22, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation to Extend Time. Wells Fargo, N.A. answer due 9/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stath v. Wells Fargo, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley T Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Represented By: Tanya N. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Stath
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Sean N. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?