Harris et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Harris, III and Connie L. Harris
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., National Default Servicing Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. doing business as Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 2:2017cv02168
Filed: August 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against Connie L. Harris, Eugene Harris, III. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 7/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Defendant Wells Fargo's #7 Motion to Dismiss. The action is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 7/17/2018 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Richard Hawkins, Esq.; Def Counsel: Thomas Beckom, Esq., Blakeley Griffith, Esq.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 10:26 AM 11:52 AM; Courtroom: 7C.The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations of counsel regarding the Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A 's #7 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing, IT IS ORDERED that the negligence claim is Dismissed. The Court will issue a written order regarding the Breach of Contract claim. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/6/2018. At the request and agreement of counsel for the parties, IT IS ORDERED that the hearing regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss set for June 12, 2018 is vacated and RESET to July 17, 2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. A hearing is set July 17, 2018. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear at this hearing. Failure to appear at the scheduled hearing time may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to monetary sanctions, granting of the opposing party's motion or case-dispositive sanctions. Each party shall have three days to notify the Courtroom Administrator by email at blanca_lenzi@nvd.uscourts.gov if unable to attend and propose an alternative hearing time after consulting with opposing counsel. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/5/2018. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss is set for June 12, 2018 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. A hearing is set June 12, 2018. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear at this hearing. Failure to appear at the scheduled hearing time may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to monetary sanctions, granting of the opposing party's motion or case-dispositive sanctions. Each party shall have three days to notify the Courtroom Administrator by email at blanca_lenzi@nvd.uscourts.gov if unable to attend and propose an alternative hearing time after consulting with opposing counsel.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Quality Loan Service Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Baker, Priscilla)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 APPENDIX to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Quality Loan Service Corporation. (Baker, Priscilla)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #18 Certificate of Interested Parties. ERROR: Document image does not match event selected for filing. CORRECTION: Priscilla Baker advised to review and refile with correct document, using the correct event. (EDS)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ERROR: Document filed incorrectly. CORRECTION: Counsel advised to review and refile using the correct event. (EDS) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Quality Loan Service Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Baker, Priscilla)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #12 the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Outcome of Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The parties shall be required to submit a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order 14 days after a decision of the motion to dismiss should any claims survive. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/2/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Cheong, Holly)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #13 Stipulation to Extend Time re #7 MOTION to Dismiss .( Replies due by 11/3/2017.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Connie L. Harris, Eugene Harris, III. Replies due by 10/20/2017. (Hawkins, Richard)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #7 Motion to Dismiss ; by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Cheong, Holly)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Outcome of Motion to Dismiss (First Request) by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Cheong, Holly)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Time re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . ( Responses due by 10/10/2017., Replies due by 10/31/2017.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL Joint Status Report filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Non-Monetary Status Pursuant to NRS 107.029)(Cheong, Holly)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #7 Motion to Dismiss ; by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Cheong, Holly)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #7 Motion to Dismiss ; by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Deed of Trust recorded on November 12, 2004, #2 Exhibit B-Assignment of Deed of Trust by Beneficiary, recorded on December 2, 2009, #3 Exhibit C-Corporate Assignment of Deed of Trust, recorded on December 2, 2016, #4 Exhibit D-Notice of Breach and Default and of Election to Cause Sale of Real Property under Deed of Trust, recorded on March 20, 2017, #5 Exhibit E-Notice of Trustees Sale, recorded on June 22, 2017, #6 Exhibit F-Deed of Trust recorded on October 19, 2007, #7 Exhibit G-Notice of Default and Election to Sell Under Deed of Trust, recorded on March 20, 2017, #8 Exhibit H-Stipulation Re: Treatment of Wells Fargos Claim Under Debtors Proposed Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Re: Real Property Located at 9113 Doane Ave, Las Vegas, NV 89143, #9 Exhibit I-Order Dismissing Case)(Cheong, Holly)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 9/19/2017. (Cheong, Holly)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL Defendants' Joint Statement Re Removed Action filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Cheong, Holly)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Stipulation to Extend Time. Defendants answers due 9/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,,, ; Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Cheong, Holly)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. added. . (Cheong, Holly)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II, on 8/14/2017. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/29/2017. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Case Number A-17-758076-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4731084), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Proof of service due by 10/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-TRO Application, #3 Exhibit C-Notices of Lis Pendens, #4 Exhibit D-Quality Loans Opposition to Plaintiffs TRO Application, #5 Exhibit E-TRO Stipulation to Vacate, #6 Exhibit F-Declaration of Non-Monetary Status Pursuant to NRS 107.029, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cheong, Holly) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Harris, III
Represented By: Richard E Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie L. Harris
Represented By: Richard E Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Represented By: Michael W. Chen
Represented By: Priscilla L Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Represented By: Holly Cheong
Represented By: Nathan Guy Kanute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Gregory L Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. doing business as Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Represented By: Holly Cheong
Represented By: Nathan Guy Kanute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?