Azcarate v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Ray Antonio Azcarate
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian Williams
Case Number: 2:2017cv02190
Filed: August 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Extend Time re 14 Amended Petition (Third Request). Respondents answer due 11/13/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Motion to Extend Time re 14 Amended Petition (Second Request). Respondents answer due 10/14/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting in part Respondents' Motion to dismiss (ECF No. 27) The portions of Ground 3 unrelated to Petitioners drug use in the first amended petition are DISMISSED as untimely.ORDERED that respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 27) is DENIED in part with respect to the timeliness of the action as a whole.ORDERED that Respondents will have forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this order to file and serve an answer, which must comply with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner will have forty-five (45) days from the date on which the answer is served to file a reply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on May 31, 2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Extend Time re 27 Motion to Dismiss (Second Request). Responses due by 10/24/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) to Extend Time
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Extend Time re 27 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Petitioner will have through 9/3/2019, to file a response to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 25 respondents' unopposed motion to enlarge time (first request) is GRANTED. Respondents will have through 5/23/2019, to file and serve an answer or other response to 14 the first amended petition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that respondents will have forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this order to answer or otherwise respond to 14 the first amended petition. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 19 motion for discovery is GRANTED. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that 16 petitioner's motion for leave to file exhibits under seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File a First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Second Request). Amended Petition due by 5/9/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 10 petitioner's unopposed motion for extension of time (first request) is GRANTED. Petitioner will have through 4/23/2018, to file and serve an amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of the court file the petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 2 petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel is GRANTED. The FPD is provisionally appointed to represent petitioner. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that the clerk shall add Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General for the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall electronically serve both the Attorney General of the State of Nevada and the FPD a copy of the petition and a copy of this order. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azcarate v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ray Antonio Azcarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?