T.R.P. Company, Inc. v. Similasan AG et al
Plaintiff: |
T.R.P. Company, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Similasan AG and Similasan Corporation |
Counter Claimant: |
Similasan Corporation |
Counter Defendant: |
T.R.P. Company, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv02197 |
Filed: |
August 16, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Mahan |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1114 Trademark Infringement |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 30, 2020 |
Filing
180
ORDER granting 179 Stipulation with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
September 18, 2020 |
Filing
177
ORDER Granting 175 Stipulation to Continue re 174 Order (Third Request). Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
April 22, 2020 |
Filing
166
ORDER granting 112 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 114 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 116 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 119 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 121 Motion for Summary Judgment; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
October 8, 2019 |
Filing
163
ORDER denying 111 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying 115 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying 120 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying 123 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying 126 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying 135 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying 138 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying 144 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying 147 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying 155 Motion to Seal; ORDER denying 162 Motion to Seal; Parties shall refile one motion per party or one stipulation due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
June 25, 2019 |
Filing
110
ORDER granting 109 Stipulation; Expert Discovery due 7/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
April 23, 2019 |
Filing
104
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
April 4, 2019 |
Filing
102
ORDER granting 85 Motion to Seal; ORDER granting 89 Motion to Seal; ORDER granting 91 Motion to Seal; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
March 27, 2019 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting 72 Motion; Plaintiff must file an updated translation of the letter attached to this order within seven days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
November 27, 2018 |
Filing
76
ORDER denying 47 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying 53 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER denying 56 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Dismiss; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
April 26, 2018 |
Filing
46
ORDER granting 45 Stipulation; Discovery due by 4/15/2019. Motions due by 5/13/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
April 19, 2018 |
Filing
44
ORDER granting 42 Stipulation to Amend Pleadings; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
January 11, 2018 |
Filing
41
ORDER granting 40 Stipulated Protective Order; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?