S.L.S. v. CCSD et al
Plaintiff: S.L.S.
Defendant: CCSD, NV Department of Education and Principal of Cashman MS
Case Number: 2:2017cv02208
Filed: August 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs have until 2/28/18 to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 9 the motion to continue hearing is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on the Amended Complaint scheduled for 1/23/18 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 1:00 PM, 2/6/18 in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 7 the Amended Complaint is for 1/23/2018 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 5 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of time to amend complaint is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs have until 1/2/18 to file an Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if an Amended Complaint is later filed, the Clerk of the Court is directed NOT to issue summons on the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The clerk shall file the complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiffs have until October 20, 2017 to file an Amended Complaint. Failure to timely file an Amended Complaint that addresses the deficiencies noted in this Order may result in a recommendation for dismissal with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that if an Amended Complaint is later filed, the Cler k of the Court is directed NOT to issue summons on the Amended Complaint. The Court will issue a screening order on the Amended Complaint and address the issuance of Summons at that time, if applicable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.L.S. v. CCSD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCSD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NV Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal of Cashman MS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.L.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?