Welch v. Ford Motor Credit
Plaintiff: Richard K. Welch
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Ford Motor Credit and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02215
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 Status Report on Notice of Settlement. See Order for deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 Notice of Settlement. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff shall have until 12/18/2017, to either file a notice of voluntary dismissal as to Bank of America, N.A., or to file a status report advising when the notice of voluntary dismissal will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 10 Notice of Settlement. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until 11/17/2017, to either file voluntary dismissal as to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, or to file a status report advisingwhen the notice of voluntary dismissal will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer due 10/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Ford Motor Credit answer due 10/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Ford Motor Credit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit
Represented By: Gary E. Schnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Jamie K Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard K. Welch
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?