Christiana Trust v. Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association
Plaintiff: Christiana Trust, a Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but as Trustee of ARLP Trust 3 and Christiana Trust
Defendant: Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association, Inc. and Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv02235
Filed: August 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #35 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-2. Incorrect case number on document. See Clerk's Notice at ECF No. 31 . The correct case number is 2:17-cv-02235-JCM-EJY.Attorney Michael Kelley is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Christiana Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Kelley, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the remaining parties shall file, within 7 days of this order, a relevant motion or status report. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #32 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to remove attorney Dana Jonathon Nitz, Esq., Aaron D. Lancaster, Esq., Christina M. Connolly, Esq., Christina Miller, Esq., Regina A. Habermas, Esq. from the Electronic Service List in this case by Plaintiff Christiana Trust. (Kelley, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:17-cv-02235-JCM-EJY. (no image attached) (AF)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #29 Stipulation to Stay Litigation. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION to Stay Litigation Pending State Court Quiet Title Action by Plaintiff Christiana Trust. (Lancaster, Aaron)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 2/22/2019. re: #27 Stipulation to Stay Litigation Pending State Court Quiet Title Action by Plaintiff Christiana Trust. Document #27 not filed pursuant to LR IA 6-2 by attorney Aaron Lancaster. The signature block must not begin on a separate page; it must appear approximately 1 inch below the last typewritten matter on the right-hand side of the last page of the stipulation or ex parte or unopposed motion Attorney Action required - Attorney Aaron Lancaster is advised to file a properly formatted stipulation in accordance with LR IA 6-2, using the correct event Notice of Corrected Image and properly link newly filed Notice to document #27 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and LR IC 2-2(d). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION to Stay Litigation Pending State Court Quiet Title Action by Plaintiff Christiana Trust. (Lancaster, Aaron)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION to Stay Litigation Pending State Court Quiet Title Action, filed by Plaintiff Christiana Trust. (Lancaster, Aaron)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kaleb D. Anderson on behalf of Defendant Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association. Amended Notice of Appearance (Anderson, Kaleb)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kaleb D. Anderson on behalf of Defendant Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association. (Anderson, Kaleb)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Interim STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Christiana Trust. (Lancaster, Aaron)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Substitute Attorney ERIC N. TRAN and KALEB ANDERSON in for Attorney SEAN L. ANDERSON and T. CHASE PITTSENBARGER by Defendant Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association. (Tran, Eric)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MR)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER re #18 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/2/2019. Motions due by 2/1/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Christiana Trust Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (Lancaster, Aaron)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that #9 the HOA's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/7/2018. In light of the Court's order #15 granting the parties' stipulation #12 , the parties' stipulation #14 is DENIED as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply Re: #9 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 1/12/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association. (Pittsenbarger, Timothy)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 12/28/2017. Re: #12 Stipulation, IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that SEAN L. ANDERSON is in violation of LR IA 6-1(c). REQUESTS FOR CONTINUANCE, EXTENSION OF TIME, OR ORDER SHORTENING TIME.ONCE CORRECTED RE-FILE USING THE "NOTICE OF CORRECTED IMAGE/DOCUMENT" EVENT IN CMECF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #9 Motion to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association. (Pittsenbarger, Timothy) Modified on 12/27/2017 to correct entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (TR).
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Christiana Trust. Replies due by 12/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Christina)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Pittsenbarger, Timothy)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association. Responses due by 12/26/2017. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/26/2018. (Pittsenbarger, Timothy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christiana Trust re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,,. Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association served on 11/21/2017, answer due 12/12/2017. (Miller, Christina)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Enlarge Time to Serve #4 Summons and #1 Complaint. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION Enlarge Time to Serve Summons and Complaint re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Christiana Trust. Responses due by 12/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Habermas, Regina)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Christiana Trust. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Nitz, Dana)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association re #1 Complaint. (MR)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Christiana Trust. (Miller, Christina)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association, filed by Plaintiff Christiana Trust. (Miller, Christina)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MR)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4744312), filed by Christiana Trust, a Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but as Trustee of ARLP Trust 3. Proof of service due by 11/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Connolly, Christina) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christiana Trust v. Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christiana Trust, a Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but as Trustee of ARLP Trust 3
Represented By: Christina M Connolly
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christiana Trust
Represented By: Michael S. Kelley
Represented By: Aaron D Lancaster
Represented By: Christina M Connolly
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Represented By: Regina A. Habermas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panorama Towers Condominium Unit Owners' Association
Represented By: Eric Tran
Represented By: Kaleb Dean Anderson
Represented By: Sean L. Anderson
Represented By: Timothy C. Pittsenbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?