Novick v. CitiMortgage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael J Novick
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02236
Filed: August 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the matter of Novick v. CitiMortgage, Inc., case number 2:17-cv- 02236-JCM-CWH, is REMANDED to Nevada state court. FURTHER ORDERED that CitiMortgage's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 4 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically.; Notice of Compliance re: LR IC 2-1 is due by 10/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the parties must file a status report within 5 days of the date of this order explaining, among other things, the status of the state court's temporary restraining order and plaintiffs motion, the status of the foreclosure sale, and the actions, if any, required by the court at this time. The other existing deadlines in this case remain in effect. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novick v. CitiMortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Novick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?