U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. Saticoy Bay LLC Series 4109 Liberal et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Harmony Homeowners Association, Homeowners Association Services, Inc. and Saticoy Bay LLC Series 4109 Liberal
Case Number: 2:2017cv02253
Filed: August 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of defendant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 1409 Liberal and against plaintiff U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 32 plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.'s motion for summary judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 31 defendant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 4109 Liberal's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that on or before 3/29/19, the parties shall file either a joint status report on the remaining claims or, if they intent to proceed to trial on these claims, a proposed joint pretrial order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth B Lowell and James W Pengilly terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying 23 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties shall file a renewed joint discovery plan no later than 12/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation to Extend Time re 11 MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint. (Responses due by 11/1/2017.) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. Saticoy Bay LLC Series 4109 Liberal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmony Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeowners Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 4109 Liberal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Victoria Hightower
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?