Park v. Zuffa, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cameron Park
Defendant: Neulion, Inc., UFC Holdings, LLC and Zuffa, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02282
Filed: August 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Stipulation to Modify Order Directing Notice to the Class; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 56 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement, Provisionally Certifying Settlement Class, Directing Notice to the Class, and Scheduling of Fairness Hearing. Fairness Hearing set for 7/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 60 Stipulation; Re: 56 Motion. Motion Hearing reset for 2/22/2018 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Setting Hearing on 51 STIPULATION to File Consolidated Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Request to Stay all deadlines., Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Defendants' 16 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings until 45 days after the JPML rules on the MDL Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Deeming Order to Show Cause Satisfied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park v. Zuffa, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neulion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UFC Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zuffa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Park
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Represented By: David A Markman
Represented By: Hart L. Robinovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?