Thomassian v. Groves et al

Plaintiff: Dan Thomassian
Defendant: Fox Rent A Car, Inc. and Brian Groves
Case Number: 2:2017cv02301
Filed: August 31, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 23 ORDER granting 22 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Grian Groves. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 9/1/2018. Motions due by 10/2/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to defendant Fox Rent A Car, Inc.. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomassian v. Groves et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Rent A Car, Inc.
Represented By: Aileen E. Cohen
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Groves
Represented By: Ryan Thomas O'Malley
Represented By: Ken M Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Thomassian
Represented By: Thomas J. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?