Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America et al v. Sandoval et al
Plaintiff: Biotechnology Innovation Organization and Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Defendant: Nevada Legislature, Brian Sandoval and Richard Whitley
Case Number: 2:2017cv02315
Filed: September 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 96 Unopposed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 87 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 86 Motion for Leave to File Document (First Request). Responses due by 5/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 48 non-party Culinary Health Fund's motion to intervene is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 27 plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 39 proposed Intervenor-Defendant Nevada Legislature's motion to intervene is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 26 plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the briefing schedule regarding 27 plaintiffs' motion fo r preliminary injunction shall proceed as follows: defendants must file their reply to plaintiffs' motion on or before 9/27/2017. Plaintiffs will thereafter have fourteen (14) days to file a reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a preliminary injunction hearing is set for 10/17/2017, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 6A. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America et al v. Sandoval et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biotechnology Innovation Organization
Represented By: Jeffrey Handwerker
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Robert Neil Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Represented By: Jeffrey Handwerker
Represented By: R. Stanton Jones
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Robert Neil Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Legislature
Represented By: Brenda J. Erdoes
Represented By: Kevin C. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Represented By: Linda C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Whitley
Represented By: Linda C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?