Schwartz-Tallard v. HSBC Bank USA, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Irene Michelle Schwartz-Tallard
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02328
Filed: September 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Ti
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 JUDGMENT for Attorney Fees. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER that Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs(ECF No. 77 ) is GRANTED. The Court awards attorney's fees pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(2) and Nev. R. Civ. P. 68 in the amount of $10,224.10 to Defendants' counsel Snell & Wilmer L.L.P. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 56 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants on all claims and close the case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 68 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 5/14/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation to extend time Re: 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 61 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 4/9/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 58 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 4/3/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation to Extend Time. Second Amended Complaint deadline: 12/17/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 33 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Replies due by 10/19/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Stipulation Re: 33 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file, no later than 12/5/17, either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan; or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation to Extend Time. HSBC Bank USA, National Association and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 10/3/2017. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Extend Deadline. All Defendants answer due 9/26/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwartz-Tallard v. HSBC Bank USA, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Blakeley E. Griffith
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Blakeley E. Griffith
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Michelle Schwartz-Tallard
Represented By: Michael J. Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?