HSBC Bank USA, N.A. v. Flamingo 316, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Defendant: Iris Cohen, Richard Cohen, Daniela Dadon, Tom Dadon, Dadon Condos, LLC, Flamingo 316, LLC, Meridian Private Residences Homeowners Association and Meridian Resorts LLC, 220 E Flamingo Unit 316 Series
Case Number: 2:2017cv02400
Filed: September 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re 82 Motion. This document was incorrectly filed as a "motion," when it is actually a "notice." The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to update the docket accordingly. Either dismissal papers for Defendant Meridian Resorts or a joint status report regarding that aspect of the case must be filed by 6/13/2019. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. The Court hereby resolves the pending order to show cause against Luis Ayon as follows: (1) Mr. Ayon must pay Plaintiff and the HOA attorneys' fees in the amount of $500 each by 6/17/2019; (2) Mr. Ayon must pay a Court fine of $ ;3,000 by 6/17/2019; and (3) this matter is referred to the Nevada State Bar for potential disciplinary proceedings. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to provide a copy of this order to the State Bar of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS Mr. Ayon, Tom Dadon, and Daniela Dadon to file declarations by 5/29/2019. A proper declaration from Shaul Dadon must be filed by 5/29/2019. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Re: 65 Stipulation. Telephonic Hearing set for 5/7/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. Plaintiff shall file, no later than 4/8/2019, either requests for default or a status report explaining how Plaintiff intends to proceed with its claims against the Cohens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING 47 HOA's Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that HSBC Banks Motion for Summary Judgment 48 is DENIED; however, partial summary judgment is sua sponte entered in favor of the defendants and against HSBC on its due-process-violation theory. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REFERRED TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties' obligation to file a joint pretrial order is stayed until 10 days after that settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/26/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 8/6/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE re 40 Order. The Court is granting that stipulation as a one-time courtesy to the parties. See Notice for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Daniela Dadon, Tom Dadon, Dadon Condos, LLC, Flamingo 316, LLC, and Meridian Resorts LLC, 220 E Flamingo Unit 316 Series answer due 10/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC Bank USA, N.A. v. Flamingo 316, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iris Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniela Dadon
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dadon
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dadon Condos, LLC
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flamingo 316, LLC
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Private Residences Homeowners Association
Represented By: Kaleb D. Anderson
Represented By: Peter E Dunkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Resorts LLC, 220 E Flamingo Unit 316 Series
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Kyle A. Ewing
Represented By: Holly Priest
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?