U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Wynn Las Vegas LLC

Defendant: Wynn Las Vegas LLC
213) 894-1301 (fax: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Case Number: 2:2017cv02405
Filed: September 14, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation to Stay Discovery Pending Settlement Discussions (First Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 27, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 10 Order Rescheduling ENE Session. Written Evaluation Statements must be delivered to chambers, not later than 4:00 p.m., 1/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 20, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Early Neutral Evaluation Session scheduled for12/7/17 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 10:00 AM, 1/25/18. All else as stated in the Order (ECF No. 8 ) scheduling the ENE remainsunchanged. E Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Wynn Las Vegas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
213) 894-1301 (fax: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Nechole M Garcia
Represented By: Derek W. Li
Represented By: Sue J. Noh
Represented By: Anna Park
Represented By: Rumduol Kim Vuong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Las Vegas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?