Hilton Resorts Corporation v. Resorts Legal Team, Inc.

Plaintiff: Hilton Resorts Corporation
Defendant: Resorts Legal Team, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02415
Filed: September 15, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 7, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 19 Motion to Dismiss (Second Request). Responses due by 12/21/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 22, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Hold FRCP 26(f) Conference and Submit proposed Stipulation Scheduling Order (First Request). Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilton Resorts Corporation v. Resorts Legal Team, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilton Resorts Corporation
Represented By: Todd J Dressel
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Guy
Represented By: Todd E. Kennedy
Represented By: John D. Wilburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resorts Legal Team, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?