McMahon v. The Howard Hughes Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Diane McMahon
Defendant: Chico's FAS, Inc. and Howard Hughes Corporation
Case Number: 2:2017cv02418
Filed: September 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until 11/28/18 to either file a stipulation to dismiss or a joint pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Michael P Lowry terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Chico's FAS, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMahon v. The Howard Hughes Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chico's FAS, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Hughes Corporation
Represented By: James D. Carraway
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Mikesell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane McMahon
Represented By: Michaela Tramel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?