JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al v. GDS Financial Services et al
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: GDS Financial Services, Diana McCall, Gary McCall, Leodegario Salvador and Squire Village at Silver Springs Community Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv02451
Filed: September 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Directing Judgment be Entered. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that 33 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 28 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that on or before May 23, 2018, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding what, if anything, remains of this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that 29 Motion for Stay Pending Decision of Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The parties shall have 14 days from the entry of the motion for summary judgment to submit an amended proposed discovery plan and scheduling order to get this case ready for trial should any claim survive. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re 1 Complaint. Diana McCall answer due 11/29/2017; Gary McCall answer due 11/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al v. GDS Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Christopher L. Benner
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Represented By: Preston Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher L. Benner
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Represented By: Preston Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GDS Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leodegario Salvador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Squire Village at Silver Springs Community Association
Represented By: Elizabeth B Lowell
Represented By: James W Pengilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?