Xcelis LLC v. Panasonic Corporation of North America
Plaintiff: Xcelis LLC
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Case Number: 2:2017cv02463
Filed: September 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Extend Time. Panasonic Corporation of North America answer due 2/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Extend Time. Panasonic Corporation of North America answer due 1/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Extend Time. Panasonic Corporation of North America answer due 12/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xcelis LLC v. Panasonic Corporation of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xcelis LLC
Represented By: Martha Logan Decker
Represented By: Vivek Ganti
Represented By: Steven Grant Hill
Represented By: Maria M Mercera
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?