Crosby v. Neuman
Plaintiff: James D Crosby
Defendant: Philip Neuman
Case Number: 2:2017cv02474
Filed: September 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Remand. Defendant's 5 Motion to Dismiss is Denied as moot. This case is REMANDED to the Eighth Judicial District Court of Clark County, Nevada. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified copy of Order and docket sheet mailed to State Court - SLD)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 19 Motion to Remand to State Court. Defendant's Responses due by 2/13/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 11 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. Notice of Compliance is due by 12/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 12 Ex Parte Motion to Continue Status and Scheduling Conference. The Status and Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2017 is vacated and continued to 1/16/2018 at 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosby v. Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Neuman
Represented By: Boris A Avramski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?