Jacobs v. Gaugan Gaming Nevada, LLC
Plaintiff: Raquel Jacobs
Defendant: Gaugan Gaming Nevada, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02517
Filed: September 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 22 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order; Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Stipulation; Re: 13 Motion to Dismiss, Responses due by 4/20/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due by 10/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Gaugan Gaming Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaugan Gaming Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Jacobs
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?