Ceballos v. Smart & Final Stores et al.

Plaintiff: Isabelle Ceballos
Defendant: Smart & Final Stores and Smart & Final Stores, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv02626
Filed: October 9, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on 25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing continued to 7/5/2018 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 9, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Extend Time to File First Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint deadline: 2/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 6, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to defendant Smart & Final Stores. ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation for Extension to Time to Answer/Respond re: 1 Complaint. Smart & Final Stores, LLC answer due 12/18/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceballos v. Smart & Final Stores et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabelle Ceballos
Represented By: E. Brent Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart & Final Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart & Final Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?