Cranford v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: |
Keishawn Cranford |
Defendant: |
James Dzurenda, Benjamin Estill, Nevada Department of Corrections, State of Nevada and Brian Williams |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv02643 |
Filed: |
October 11, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 9, 2020 |
Filing
47
ORDER granting 46 Motion to Reschedule the Settlement Conference. The settlement conference is CONTINUED to 8:30 a.m. on December 10, 2020. The parties must submit settlement conference statements as instructed in the Court's order at Do cket No. 39 by 3:00 p.m. on December 3, 2020. Defendants must arrange for Plaintiff's virtual presence at the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
October 2, 2020 |
Filing
45
ORDER. The settlement conference is CONTINUED to 9:30 a.m. on November 19, 2020. No later than November 5, 2020, Plaintiff must submit a settlement conference statement by mail or as instructed in the Court's order at Docket No. 39 . The Cl erk of Court is INSTRUCTED to send this order and a copy of the Court's order at Docket No. 39 to Plaintiff's physical address, as well as the email address provided on the docket.In light of Plaintiff being in prison, the Attorney Gen eral's Office is INSTRUCTED to coordinate with the undersigned's courtroom deputy, Ari Caytuero at 702-464-5566, to facilitate Plaintiff's video conference appearance at the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: P by mail and email order and 39 HAM)
|
August 19, 2020 |
Filing
42
ORDER granting 41 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
August 4, 2020 |
Filing
38
ORDER granting 36 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Dispositive Motion Deadline. Motions due by 11/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
March 23, 2020 |
Filing
31
ORDER Denying 28 Motion for Sanctions and 30 Motion to stay dispositive motion deadline pending a ruling on the motion for Rule 37 discovery sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
July 17, 2019 |
Filing
19
ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Extend Time to Complete Discovery. A response shall be filed no later than 7/19/2019, and any reply shall be filed no later than 7/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
January 14, 2019 |
Filing
12
ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Service must be perfected within ninety (90) days from the date of this order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: State of Nevada Attorney General, Chief of Inmate Services for the Nevada Department of Corrections - ADR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?