Luna et al v. Cegavske et al
Plaintiff: Diane Crump-Richmond, Demi Falcon, Susan Florian, Nora Luna and Bilal Shabazz
Defendant: Barbara Cegavske and Joseph Gloria
Intervenor Defendant: Public Interest Legal Foundation
Case Number: 2:2017cv02666
Filed: October 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 69 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Sambo Dul withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Lawrence VanDyke withdrawn from the case as counsel for Defendant BarbaraCegavske. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 23 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying 34 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER denying 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court within thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 12 the Foundation's Motion to Intervene be denied, insofar as it is based on intervention of right under Rule 24(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2018. ORDER that 12 the Foundation's Motion to Intervene is granted insofar as it moves for permissive intervention under Rule 24(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Foundation may file the proposed answer in intervention. The parties shall promptly confer regarding the need for discovery and/or a briefing schedule regarding the filing of further dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation to Extend Hearin Date Re: 12 Motion to Intervene. Motion Hearing reset for 12/13/2017 at 03:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiffs' 38 Motion to Stay. The hearing currently set for 11/29/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that responses to 34 Motion to Dismiss are due by Tuesday, November 21, 2017. Replies to the responses to the motion to dismiss are due by Monday, November 27, 2017.FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is set for oral argument on Wednesday, November 29, 2017 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. In this hearing, the court will hear argument on the motion for a preliminary injunction (ECF No. 17 ), defendant Gloria's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 23 ), and State of Nevada's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 34 ). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that responses to 17 the motion for a preliminary injunction are due by Thursday, 11/16/17. Replies to the responses to 17 the motion for a preliminary injunction are due by Tuesday, 11/21/17. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that responses to 23 the motion to dismiss are due by Thursday, 11/16/17. Replies to the responses to 23 the motion to dismiss are due by Tuesday, 11/21/17. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is set for oral argument on Wednesday, 11/29/17 a t 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. In this hearing, the court will hear argument on both 17 the motion for a preliminary injunction and 23 the motion to dismiss. No other matters will be heard in this hearing. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna et al v. Cegavske et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Cegavske
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Represented By: Joseph Tartakovsky
Represented By: Lawrence VanDyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Gloria
Represented By: Mary-Anne M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Crump-Richmond
Represented By: Jacki L. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demi Falcon
Represented By: Jacki L. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Florian
Represented By: Jacki L. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Luna
Represented By: Jacki L. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bilal Shabazz
Represented By: Jacki L. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Public Interest Legal Foundation
Represented By: David C OMara
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?