Dalope v. Chanel, Inc.

Plaintiff: Elsie Dalope
Defendant: Chanel, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02700
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2018 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 75 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 20, 2018 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 68 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 60 Motion for Protective Order and 62 Counter Motion to Compel (Second Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 18, 2018 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 62 Counter Motion to Compel. Responses due by 6/18/2018. Replies due by 6/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 28, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: Mr. Stovall shall pay Defendant's attorneys' fees in the amount of $4,847 within 14 days of the issuance of this order. Mr. Stovall shall pay a fine of $1,000 within 14 days of the iss uance of this order, made payable to the "Clerk, U.S. District Court." See Order for further details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)
January 31, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court FIRST ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing, no later than 2/13/2018, why this case should not be dismissed. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 1, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Continue Hearing re 11 Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session. The early neutral evaluation is ADVANCED to 1:30 p.m. on 1/30/2018. The parties shall submit their early neutral evaluation statements by 3:00 p.m. on 1/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalope v. Chanel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: Neil M. Alexander
Represented By: Timothy Roehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Dalope
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Represented By: Richard Waltjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?