Bell v. Core Civic et al
Plaintiff: |
Cameron Bell |
Defendant: |
Steven Carpenter, Core Civic, Ms. Hollins, Mr. McMutturey and US Marshals Office |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv02709 |
Filed: |
October 23, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 4, 2022 |
Filing
119
ORDER Denying 106 Motion and 113 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
November 5, 2021 |
Filing
117
ORDER denying 116 Motion for the Clerk to provide Subpoena Duces Tecum. This case is closed. Accordingly, it is not appropriate for Plaintiff to be issuing subpoenas to anyone related to this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
October 14, 2021 |
Filing
110
ORDER granting 108 MOTION for Docket Sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, docket sheet also enclosed - DRS)
|
October 9, 2020 |
Filing
93
ORDER denying 80 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
June 15, 2020 |
Filing
85
ORDER Denying 83 Motion for Hearing; and 84 MOTION for Copies. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
March 10, 2020 |
Filing
78
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 67 the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 59 the plaintiff's motion for additional discovery is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 53 the defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
January 6, 2020 |
Filing
73
ORDER Re: 72 Proposed Subpoenas which the Court construes as a Motion. Defendants' Responses due by 1/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
December 23, 2019 |
Filing
71
ORDER Denying Defendants' 69 Motion to Extend/Stay Deadline to Respond to 67 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Responses due by 1/10/2020. Plaintiff will have 14 days after service of that Response to file any Reply. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
December 10, 2019 |
Filing
70
ORDER that Bell's 42 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Documents and Witness Forms is GRANTED. CoreCivic and McMurtrey's 45 Motion to Extend Time to File Discovery Motions is DENIED as moot. Bell's 46 Ex Parte Motion for Issuan ce of Subpoena Duces Tecum for Psychology Records is DENIED without prejudice. Bell's 47 Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum for Documents, Video Surveillance, and Photographs of the Incident is DENIED without prejudice. The clerk of court must UNSEAL ECF No. 46 and ECF No. 47 so the documents are accessible to the public. CoreCivic and McMurtrey's 49 Motion to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions is DENIED as moot. Bell's 50 Motion to Exten d Time to File Discovery Motions is DENIED. Bell's 51 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is DENIED. Bell's 61 and 62 Motion for Status Report and Teleconference is DENIED without prejudice. Bell's 63 Motion for Scheduling Order to be Amended is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; mailed AO 88, AO 88A, and AO 88B Subpoena forms to Plaintiff - SLD)
|
August 15, 2018 |
Filing
12
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file his updated address with the Court within 30 days from the date of this order. If Plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order the Court shall dismiss this case without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?