Eyetalk365, LLC v. Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited
Defendant: Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited
Counter Defendant: Eyetalk365, LLC
919) 246-9113 (fax: Eyetalk365, LLC
Counter Claimant: Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited
Case Number: 2:2017cv02714
Filed: October 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice pursuant to ECF No. 242 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER that the parties shall have until April 18, 2019, to either file a stipulation to dismiss with prejudice, or a joint status report indicating when the stipulation will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting ECF No. 236 / 238 Stipulation to Stay All Deadlines Pending Resolution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting ECF No. 224 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply in Support of ECF No. 221 Motion for Reconsideration. Response due by 12/21/2018. Reply due by 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting ECF No. 199 Stipulation to Extend re ECF No. 196 Motion to Compel (First Request): Defendants' response due by 11/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (ECF No. 116 ) is GRANTED. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER re ECF No. 177 Motion to Seal. The Sealed Exhibit (ECF No. 85), in Case No. 3:17-cv-00686, and Sealed Exhibit (ECF No. 179 ), in Case No. 2:17-cv-02714, referenced in Zmodo's motions shall remain under seal until August 23, 2018. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting ECF No. 167 Defendant Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited's Motion to Extend Time to File Response to ECF No. 159 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify. (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER approving ECF No. 132 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Marcus A. Barber on behalf of Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited and approving Designation of Local Counsel Chad R. Fears. Signed by Judge Robe rt C. Jones on 6/28/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting ECF No. 121 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited to file opposition to ECF No. 116 Motion to Compel. Opposition/ response due by 5/29/2018. The parties shall comply with the requirements of LR IA 6-2 governing the required form of order for stipulations or unopposed motion in any future applications for relief from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting ECF No. 119 Motion to Substitute Attorney Richard G. Campbell, Jr. in for Attorney Melanie D. Morgan on behalf of Defendant Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/22/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER that the disputed terms are construed as follows : See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting ECF No. 112 Joint Stipulation re Discovery. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER re ECF No. 195 Notice to remove Attorney Edward Cole from CM/ECF Notice List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER SCHEDULING A POST-CLAIM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for 6/6/2018 at 9:30 AM in LV Chambers Rm 3071 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Confidential settlement statements due by 5/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying ECF Nos. 13 , 26 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REASSIGNMENT ORDER that Case No. 3:17-cv-00686-MMD-WGC is reassigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, and all future pleadings must bear case number 3:17-cv-00686-RCJ-PAL. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eyetalk365, LLC v. Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Eyetalk365, LLC
Represented By: Tim Craddock
Represented By: Kirk Alan Parry, Jr.
Represented By: Gary R. Sorden
Represented By: Michelle Merck Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
919) 246-9113 (fax: Eyetalk365, LLC
Represented By: Tim Craddock
Represented By: Kirk Alan Parry, Jr.
Represented By: Gary R. Sorden
Represented By: Michelle Merck Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited
Represented By: Edward B. Cole
Represented By: Thomas Pasternak
Represented By: John M. Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited
Represented By: Edward B. Cole
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Thomas Pasternak
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: John M. Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?