Bank of America, N.A. v. Saticoy Bay LLC Series

Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series
Case Number: 2:2017cv02808
Filed: November 7, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Charles Geisendorf terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 30, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation to Allow Plaintiff to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 27, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Stipulation to Stay Case for 90 days; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/27/2018.; Case stayed. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Saticoy Bay LLC Series
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Corrine P. Murphy
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series
Represented By: Charles Geisendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?