Williams v. TLC Casino Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Valarie Williams
Defendant: Four Queens, LLC and TLC Casino Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02810
Filed: November 7, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 9 defendant's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. The clerk is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 17, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph A. Kroeger for Four Queens, LLC and TLC Casino Enterprises, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Paul Swenson Prior. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 11, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 9 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Replies due by 1/18/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 28, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). Four Queens, LLC answer due 12/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. TLC Casino Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Queens, LLC
Represented By: Paul Swenson Prior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLC Casino Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valarie Williams
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Kaine M. Messer
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?